GOA DOG FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Goa Dog Foundation's prime focus is animal welfare, animal birth control, education and facilitating a safe place for rescued animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 20 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Riley | Chair | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Elizabeth Ashby | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £22.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | £8.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION'S PURPOSES ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY IN GOA, INDIA AND THE UK BY:- • USING LOCAL LABOUR, VOLUNTEERS AND TRUSTEES, PROVIDE DAILY FOOD, STERILISATION, REGULAR CARE FOR THE ANIMALS AND FACILITATE FOSTER/ADOPTION HOMES. • EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS ACROSS THE WORLD. • PROVIDING AND COORDINATING VOLUNTEERS TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF ANIMAL WELFARE INTERNATIONALLY. • FACILITATING SPAY/NEUTERING PROGRAMMES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
IN GOA, INDIA AND THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 EATON ROAD NORTH
West Derby Village
LIVERPOOL
- Phone:
- 004407880575825
- Email:
- goadogfoundation@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window