IW STORY FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the arts, culture and heritage for public benefit, and in particular the art of literature and storytelling, by the establishment and maintenance of an annual festival aimed at children, young people and families on the Isle of Wight. To advance the education of children & young people by promoting and providing opportunities for the appreciation, understanding and creation of stories
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £13,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 22 February 2022: CIO registration
- ISLE OF WIGHT STORY FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanette Pamela Howells | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Francis Bacon | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peta Jane Hodge | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Giddens | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Kathleen Jackson | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey John Banks | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bailey | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.40k | £40.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.14k | £34.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £13.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE IW STORY FESTIVAL ARE: A) TO PROMOTE THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF LITERATURE AND STORYTELLING, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL SPECIFICALLY AIMED AT CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE APPRECIATION, UNDERSTANDING AND CREATION OF STORIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
156 PARK ROAD
COWES
PO31 7NE
- Phone:
- 07837 601315
- Email:
- iwstoryfestival@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window