ANTIOCH HOUSE OF WORSHIP WEST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Antioch House of Worship is a local church based in London, United Kingdom. Our mission is to spread awareness of Lord Jesus, and to make him make him known through the preaching of the gospel. We love and value every person because each of us matters to the Lord. In everything we do, we seek to glorify God (Jesus) and edify man
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bhim Gurung | Chair | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dhan Galami Thapa | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Padam Sunuwar | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Santosh Rai | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Krishnakumar Rai | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prakash Rai | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.51k | £55.35k | £78.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.10k | £19.18k | £24.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AND PRACTICES IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN WEST LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
114 SPRING GROVE ROAD
HOUNSLOW
TW3 4BW
- Phone:
- 07878391839
- Email:
- grgsang@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window