THREE HOLY HIERARCHS ROMANIAN ORTHODOX COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity primarily funds the provision of religious services for the Romanian Community in Greater Manchester. Also, the Charity supports the Christian Orthodox Community (communities) with respect to education, relief of poverty and other social and spiritual goods and services. The services of the Charity are open to all those interested.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fr. Marius Constantin Stavar | Chair | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Florentina Dragoi | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liviu Anton | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Florin Sava | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marin Lazarescu | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Stoica | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.88k | £45.60k | £36.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £8.58k | £14.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO FALL UNDER THE PURPOSES OF ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEVING POVERTY AND ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT. THEY ARE: TO ADVANCE THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP IN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ROMANIAN PEOPLE OR PEOPLE OF ROMANIAN DESCENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND/OR COURSES IN SUBJECTS AS ENGLISH LANGUAGE, ROMANIAN LANGUAGE, EMPLOYABILITY AND INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY (ICT) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, ROMANIA AND WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, THE PROVISION OF ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO ADVANCE THE CITIZENSHIP AND TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF ROMANIAN PEOPLE OR PEOPLE OF ROMANIAN DESCENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, PROMOTING GOOD CITIZENSHIP, BY RISING AWARENESS OF DISCRIMINATION, BY ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO DEVELOP TALENTS AND CAPABILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SOCIETY AS A WHOLE AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Arkwright Avenue
Rochdale
Greater Manchester
OL16 2BP
- Phone:
- 07741478175
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window