THE JAMES STANSFIELD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity will support other charities operating in the health and social care sectors if they support armed services people who have lost limbs or suffered similar trauma as a result of conflict
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 2021: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Alan Marett | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Silk | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Marett | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £473.81k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS ESTABLISHED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PURPOSE OF HELPING ARMED SERVICES PEOPLE AND FORMER ARMED SERVICES PEOPLE WHO HAVE LOST LIMBS OR SUFFERED SIMILAR TRAUMA AS A RESULT OF CONFLICT TO MANAGE THEIR HEALTH AND SOCIAL NEEDS SO THAT THEY MAY LIVE AS WELL AS POSSIBLE WITH THEIR MEDICAL AND PHYSICAL CONDITION AND CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR OWN WELLBEING SO THAT THEY PLAY AS FULL PART AS POSSIBLE IN THEIR COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STONE HAVEN
METTON ROAD
ROUGHTON
NORWICH
NR11 8QT
- Phone:
- 07990001470
- Email:
- info@merettschariots.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window