BARKING ROTARY KIDS DAYS OUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise and fund days out for underpriviliged and special needs children in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clayton McDonald Hope | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Sydney Ford | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alec Everitt | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £11.35k | £1.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £7.84k | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME WILL DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING RESPITE THROUGH SPECIALLY ORGANISED DAY TRIPS AND OUTINGS WITH THEIR PEERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
170 Longbridge Road
BARKING
Essex
IG11 8ST
- Phone:
- 07931187248
- Email:
- aleceveritt@ymail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window