PERRY'S PANTRY FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A food bank and pantry scheme helping people with low or no income in and around South Manchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,097 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
- 07 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniela Preece | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sutheran | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia REILLY-HURST | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iyinka Abibi | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Armstrong Hall | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.40k | £72.66k | £84.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.92k | £60.98k | £90.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.80k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 01 August 2023 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 March 2022
(These accounts |
01 August 2023 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN SOUTH MANCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY OTHER CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Mersey Bank Avenue
MANCHESTER
M21 7NN
- Phone:
- 07563573358
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window