COMICBOOKS FOR KIDS UK!

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY WHO ARE PATIENTS IN NHS HOSPITALS OR CHARITABLE HOSPICES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF READING, COLOURING, TOYS, AND POP CULTURE MATERIALS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND/ OR ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE NHS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark David Weiss | Chair | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Michael O'Mullane | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Casey Dziewiatkowski | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
COMICBOOKS FOR KIDS! | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £851 | £205 | £7.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16 | £701 | £564 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY WHO ARE PATIENTS IN NHS HOSPITALS OR CHARITABLE HOSPICES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF READING, COLOURING, TOYS, AND POP CULTURE MATERIALS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND/ OR ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE NHS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O DUANE MORRIS
CITYPOINT
1 ROPEMAKER STREET
LONDON
EC2Y 9AW
- Phone:
- 0016306596087
- Email:
- mark@comicbooksforkids.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window