MY HOME SWEET HOME CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH AND DISABILITY, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE IN SECURING ACCOMMODATION AND SUPPORTED LIVING SERVICES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 05 January 2022: CIO registration
- MY HOME SWEET HOME (Previous name)
- MY HOME SWEET HOME CIC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terase Casillas | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Pedro Casillas | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH AND DISABILITY, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE IN SECURING ACCOMMODATION AND SUPPORTED LIVING SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 York House
Frances Drive
DUNSTABLE
Bedfordshire
LU6 1GH
- Phone:
- 07788648959
- Email:
- hsh@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window