Trustees OXFORD BROOKES STUDENTS UNION LTD
Charity number: 1194635

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olamide Olalekan-Sule | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Coral Taylor | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Benjamin Robert Wakeford | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Fyneface | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Barborica | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessika Damarys Nogueira Linhaca | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tom Ritchie | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kofi Owusu-Aidoo | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Thonemann | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas William Flynn | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Finney | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Adrian White | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.