HARROGATE RUFC LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit in Harrogate and surrounding area through the provision of facilities to enable participation in the sport of amateur rugby union football. (For the purposes of this clause facilities means land, buildings, equipment, access to coaching and organising sporting activities).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 September 2021: Standard registration
- HARROGATE RUGBY (HOLDINGS) LIMITED (Previous name)
- HARROGATERUGBY(HOLDINGS)LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Garrett | Chair | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Corbett | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.26k | £134.77k | £146.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.83k | £122.14k | £140.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2023
(These accounts |
26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HARROGATE AND SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF AMATEUR RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “FACILITIES” MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUDDING LANE
FOLLIFOOT
HARROGATE
HG3 1DQ
- Phone:
- 01423815420
- Email:
- treasurer@harrogaterugby.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window