WE-TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We-Together's aim is to realise a permanent, meaningful increase in the conviction rate of sexual offenders across England and Wales. It will do this by using a unique technological solution to identify serial predators. This will increase reporting by victims, and increase the likelihood of identifying and prosecting serial perpetrators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Judith Frances Miller | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Chitra Balakrishna | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Perry Power | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Richard De Villeneuve Kidwell | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Richard Benge | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Claire Benge | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.05k | £8.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £3.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND TO FACILITATE THE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE FOR VICTIMS OF SEXUAL ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF AN ANONYMISED DATABASE FOR THE RECORDING OF SEXUAL ABUSE AND HISTORIC ABUSE TO ESTABLISH PATTERNS THAT CAN IDENTIFY POTENTIAL SERIAL ABUSERS 2.THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF SEXUAL ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF: A)INFORMATION ON THE HEALTH ISSUES, BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL, ASSOCIATED WITH SEXUAL ABUSE. B)INFORMATION ON, AND LINKS TO, ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS THAT CAN OFFER SUPPORT TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF VICTIMS OF SEXUAL ABUSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Kingston Deverill
WARMINSTER
Wiltshire
BA12 7HG
- Phone:
- 07913636544
- Email:
- info@we-together.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window