Ford to Hunston Canal Society

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ford to Hunston Canal Society seeks to promote for the benefit of the public the improvement and maintenance of the heritage of the Ford to Hunston section of the Portsmouth & Arundel Canal, in the Chichester and Arun Districts of West Sussex, as well as advancing the education of the public in these areas on history and architecture of the Canal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 December 2021: CIO registration
- BURNDELL BRIDGE SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Cordingley | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Ramshaw | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lee Kuhler | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Allen Keith Misselbrook | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Saunders | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|||||
John Richard Boulter | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Keith Willis Gadd | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £421 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £124 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2021 as amended on 01 May 2023 as amended on 01 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FORD TO HUNSTON CANAL SOCIETY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT, ENHANCEMENT, AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE OF THE PORTSMOUTH & ARUNDEL CANAL WITHIN THE CHICHESTER AND ARUN DISTRICTS OF WEST SUSSEX, BETWEEN FORD AND HUNSTON, INCLUDING THE BURNDELL BRIDGE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE HERITAGE OF THE PORTSMOUTH & ARUNDEL CANAL, BETWEEN FORD AND HUNSTON, WORKING WITH EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS TO ENHANCE KNOWLEDGE IN THE HISTORY OF THE CANAL HERITAGE ALONG THIS SECTION OF THE CANAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 DOWNVIEW CLOSE
YAPTON
ARUNDEL
BN18 0LD
- Phone:
- 07976740749
- Email:
- hello@fhcs.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window