UNITED BLACKPOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To stop homelessness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 22 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Conway MBE | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 481 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 481 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2023 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2023 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH IN THE COMMUNITY AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) HOMELESS PEOPLE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, ADVOCACY AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
219 HARDHORN ROAD
POULTON-LE-FYLDE
FY6 8DW
- Phone:
- 07803578951
- Email:
- chris@unitedblackpool.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window