FRIENDS OF CORONATION ROAD PLAYGROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends is set up and run by parents and carers of children using Coronation Road Playcentre. We aim to support and encourage open access fully inclusive play opportunties in a safe and secure environment for children aged 5-12 yrs old in and around the Selly Oak area of Birmingham. We support the centre by fundraising for play equipment, disco's, parties and coach hire for day trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 October 1986: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CORONATION ROAD ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND (Working name)
- GROUNDS FOR GROWTH (Working name)
- CORONATION ROAD ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE JOLLY | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAULA MADDEN | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.93k | £5.25k | £10.74k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.72k | £6.55k | £11.45k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1575 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED 28 APRIL 1994.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE PROVISION OF SUPERVISED FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN SELLY OAK, BIRMINGHAM BEING FACILITIES: (A) OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL BEING.
Area of benefit
SELLY OAK, BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 CARTLAND ROAD
STIRCHLEY
BIRMINGHAM
B30 2SG
- Phone:
- 07940929143
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window