FRIENDS OF GRAVELEY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide funding to support activities or equipment which enrich the education provided by Graveley Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 September 2021: Standard registration
- FOG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirstie Jayne Gran | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Howes | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Staples | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Rebecca Pickstone-Groves | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Stewart | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA LEIGH OTTO | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Homes | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/08/2022 | 26/08/2023 | 26/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.04k | £4.37k | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £4.97k | £10.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 August 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 August 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 August 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRAVELEY JUNIOR MIXED SCHOOL
ASHWELL COMMON
GRAVELEY
HITCHIN
SG4 7LJ
- Phone:
- 01438351377
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window