Accounts and annual returns THE CHAMBER ORCHESTRA OF THE WEST

Charity number: 1194567
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 28 August 2024 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 28 August 2024 209 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window