THE KINGDOM CHURCH UK

Charity number: 1194932
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing various Christian services to its members and community - not limited to worship services, gospel singing and music, biblical preaching and teaching, corporate and individual prayer, and pastoral counselling. Also, the compelling of covenant to God, and support and covenant to the Senior Pastor, our fellowship - the Pentecostal Churches of Jesus Christ (PCJC), and the Presiding Prelate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £43,469
Total expenditure: £42,397

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 2021: CIO registration
  • 04 May 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • Love Fellowship Tabernacle (Working name)
  • THE KINGDOM CHURCH HOUSE OF CONSECRATION, GLOUCESTER (Previous name)
  • The Kingdom Church Love Fellowship Tabernacle, London (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022
Total gross income £43.47k
Total expenditure £42.40k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time