THE JOHN GOLDING ARTISTIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the artistic work of Dr John Golding CBE painter
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Mexico
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 07 June 2021: Standard registration
- JGAT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Sebastian Zuckerman PhD MA | Chair | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DOMINIC SHEERIN | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Greenall MA | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.37k | £6.33k | £24.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.16k | £18.93k | £43.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, OF THE VISUAL ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF THE LIFE, WORKS AND ARTISTIC LEGACY OF HAROLD JOHN GOLDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 GROSVENOR ROAD
LONDON
SW1V 3LG
- Phone:
- 02078343055
- Email:
- zuckassoc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window