BEDROOM ARTISTS COLLECTIVE


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 27 February 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold exhibitions to share art created by emerging and independent artists with the public, we run arts workshops for the public, and encourage and inspire the public to engage with art and creative practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2021: CIO registration
- BAC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Stevens | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Pallot | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY HOLDING EXHIBITIONS TO SHARE ART CREATED BY EMERGING AND INDEPENDENT ARTISTS WITH THE PUBLIC, BY RUNNING ARTS WORKSHOPS FOR THE PUBLIC, AND BY ENCOURAGING AND INSPIRING THE PUBLIC TO ENGAGE WITH ART AND CREATIVE PRACTICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5E High Street
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 5NN
- Phone:
- 07930919199
- Email:
- bedroomartists@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window