Accounts and annual returns THE POTTER'S HOUSE CHRISTIAN CENTRE SOUTH WALES

Charity Number: 1195983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 November 2023 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 November 2023 129 days late Download Open in new window