FRIENDS OF THE EAST KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to educate the public in all the transport heritage and character of the East Kent Road Car Company Ltd and other public transport operators in Kent and surrounding areas, by restoring and preserving vintage buses for public display. Also, to provide for the benefit of former employees of the companies and families,the facility of leisure time activities in the interest of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2025
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 11 October 2021: Standard registration
- FOTEK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Bamford | Chair | 08 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Watkins | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Ann Barrett | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Seddon | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harry Triptree | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Troth-Alexander | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alwyn Conway | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EVANS | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | 31/03/2025 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.43k | £18.67k | £19.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.44k | £12.73k | £13.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2025 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2025 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
THE GROUP’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE TRANSPORT HERITAGE AND CHARACTER OF THE EAST KENT ROAD CAR COMPANY LIMITED IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND BY RESTORING AND PRESERVING VINTAGE BUSES FOR PUBLIC DISPLAY. 3.2 TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF FORMER AND/OR RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THE EAST KENT ROAD CAR COMPANY LIMITED, AND THEIR FAMILIES, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Knockholt Road
Cliftonville
Margate
Kent
CT9 3HL
- Phone:
- 01304239685
- Email:
- ajconway1944@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window