IN2SPORTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a wide variety of sports and leisure opportunities ranging from cricket, football, volleyball, handball, badminton, dodgeball, a range of martial arts, gym exercise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 10 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonia De Leon Trujillo | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zakir Hussain Khan | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Callum Robert Samuel Wear | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.26k | £189.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.55k | £185.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF A RANGE OF SPORTS INCLUDING CRICKET, FOOTBALL, NETBALL, HOCKEY AND VOLLEYBALL; (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR: I) INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR II) THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
In2 Sports
40 Harbord Square
LONDON
E14 9QH
- Phone:
- 02045394947
- Email:
- info@in2sports.org
- Website:
-
www,in2sports.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window