Trustees 1ST HELMSLEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1194522
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Scott Smith | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Thompson | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Munnis | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Beck | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Plowman | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Dickinson | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Evans | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Pryor | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.