UMOJA HEALTH FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to improve co-ordination of services and resources allocated to Africa communities and ensure their voices are heard, addressing barriers and services are put in place which recognize our ethnic, cultural and religious needs. Our range of services; advocacy work, social activities and support for elders, children, young people, single parents and adults who lack appropriate support network
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £5,381 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 22 November 2021: Standard registration
- AFRICAN HEALTH FORUM (Previous name)
- UMOJA HEALTH FORUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hafsa Muhammad | Chair | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Babra Murphy | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
AMY SEIDI | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KHADIDIA CAMARA | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patience Nyaika | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Agerrymith | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.83k | £65.88k | £53.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.88k | £38.79k | £56.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £9.95k | £5.38k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.23k | £9.95k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 SEP 2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH WITHIN THE AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES, THEIR CARERS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATION, HEALTH ADVICE, SIGNPOSTING ON HEALTH ISSUES AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HEALTH ISSUES THAT AFFECT THE CARIBBEAN AND AFRICAN COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 GREENWOOD PLACE
LONDON
NW5 1LB
- Phone:
- 07970418893
- Email:
- umojahealthforum54@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window