THE ATHENA ART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Athena Art Foundation posts on its digital hub and social media feeds innovative and accessible material about pre-modern art in museums and other locations around the world. The Athena team gathers material for the hub from a wide range of websites, publications, newsletters and promotional material, as well as producing podcasts, films, livestreams and other material of our own.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 August 2021: CIO registration
- ATHENA ART FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ros Lawler | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Mark Harris | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
AMANDA JANE BRADLEY PETITGAS | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Suzanne Jane Marriott | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Sussan Babaie | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.23k | £49.41k | £45.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.79k | £49.57k | £38.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE APPRECIATION OF PRE-20TH CENTURY ART BY THE PROVISION OF: A. A FREE-TO-ACCESS DIGITAL HUB WITH LINKS TO HIGH QUALITY INFORMATION AND ONLINE RESOURCES FROM MUSEUMS AND OTHER ARTS ORGANISATIONS AND PUBLICATIONS WORLDWIDE ABOUT GREAT PRE-20TH CENTURY ART FROM THE EUROPEAN AND OTHER TRADITIONS, WITH THE AIM OF ENCOURAGING A WIDE RANGE OF PEOPLE AROUND THE WORLD TO ENJOY AND LEARN ABOUT THIS ART, AND; B. GATHERING TOGETHER THE VOICES OF CURATORS, ARTISTS AND OTHERS WHO PASSIONATELY BELIEVE THAT GREAT PRE-20TH CENTURY ART HELPS US TO REFLECT ON LIFE TODAY AND IMAGINE THE WORLD TOMORROW, ATHENA’S DIGITAL PLATFORM AND SOCIAL MEDIA WILL CURATE, PRODUCE AND SHARE INNOVATIVE AND ACCESSIBLE PODCASTS, IMAGE-LED FEATURES, IMMERSIVE EXPERIENCES, ONLINE EXHIBITIONS, PUBLICATIONS AND SHORT COURSES, AS WELL AS INFORMATION ABOUT WHAT’S ON AND INVITATIONS TO LIVE TALKS AND GATHERINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EIGHTH FLOOR
6 NEW STREET SQUARE
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07940375659
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window