LLANDYRNOG VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings, facilities and open space for education, training and religious activities together with other social, leisure and cultural events. This primarily for the local community but is available for the public generally including other charities and voluntarybodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 30 September 1986: Standard registration
- NEUADD LLANDYRNOG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWILYM CHARLES EVANS GC | Chair |
|
||||||
Helen Wilson Jones | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Gayle | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Rowlands | Trustee | 20 February 1998 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BRYN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWYN ROWLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IONA SALUSBURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS G JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS W M WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.78k | £17.15k | £9.93k | £17.07k | £13.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.96k | £5.94k | £5.03k | £27.42k | £14.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 November 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2021 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 20 MAY 1948.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LLANDYRNOG IN THE COUNTY OF DENBIGH AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THESE PRESENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LLANDYRNOG
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
Llangwyfan
DENBIGH
Clwyd
LL16 4LU
- Phone:
- 01824790401
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window