CRESCENT FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fulfill the need of a food bank that can cater to specific dietary requirements and needs of individuals and families more so with the dependency on food banks having increased since the start of Covid-19 pandemic. Although providing food support is our main focus, we also provide essential items such as hygiene and baby products on request.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bolton
Governance
- 16 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Farid Ahmed Patel | Chair | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yasin Mohamed Hanif Ibrahim | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zakir Bux | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ismail | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.76k | £60.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.56k | £37.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN BOLTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING FOOD AID AND RELIEF GOODS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE COLLECTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF DONATIONS AND THE OPERATION OF A FOOD BANK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crescent Food Bank
295A Blackburn Road
BOLTON
BL1 8HB
- Phone:
- 03337726299
- Email:
- info@crescentfoodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window