KURD ASSOCIATION OF DERBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities of religious organizations. ( Mosque )
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Taha Mustafa | Chair | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ABUBAKER RASSOL | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jaza Morawati | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.26k | £13.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.13k | £5.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 JAN 2021 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND CARRYING OUT OUTREACH WORK IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KAOD
Unit 4b Stanhope Street
DERBY
DE23 6QJ
- Phone:
- 07564743030
- Email:
- Kaod20@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window