NISA GLOBAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes Education / training Advancement of health Prevention and relief of poverty Makes grants to small women led organisations in developing countries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Cameroon
- Greece
- India
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
Governance
- 19 May 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nazmin Akthar | Chair | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr IRAM SATTAR | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Fozia Uddin | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Shaista Gohir | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £10.63k | £10.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.09k | £5.65k | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (?OBJECTS?) ARE: (1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY: A. PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE OR PREVENT POVERTY; B. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, PROJECTS AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT (INCLUDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT) DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; C. UNDERTAKING, COMMISSIONING OR SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THE CONTRIBUTING FACTORS (2) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL AND MENTAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF ILLNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY: A. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, SERVICES, FACILITIES (INCLUDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES) AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND/OR PRESERVATION OF HEALTH; B. UNDERTAKING, COMMISSIONING OR SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO SICKNESS AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THE CONTRIBUTING FACTORS; C. RAISING AWARENESS AND ADVANCING EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH (3) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN NEED (IN PARTICULAR WOMEN AND GIRLS IN THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY) ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF EDUCATION; B. PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION; C. ASSISTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY OR OTHER ORGANISATION WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PEOPLE (IN PARTICULAR WOMEN AND GIRLS IN THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY) BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES (4) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Muslim Women's Network UK
First Floor
1192 Stratford Road
BIRMINGHAM
B28 8AB
- Phone:
- 07802 225989
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window