ASU GLOBAL FOUNDATION UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASU Global Foundation UK Ltd provides philanthropic support and investments to advance Arizona State University's goals for inclusion, student success, discover and local and global impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 19 December 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gina Domanig | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frances Prenn | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Samuel Searle | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gretchen Elizabeth Buhlig | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sir Malcolm John Grant | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
James William O'Brien | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Denise Senecal de Fonseca | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.48k | £370.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.48k | £261.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 NOV 2022 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 DEC 2022 as amended on 07 Feb 2023 as amended on 23 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO SUPPORT SUCH OF THE ACTIVITIES OF ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARRER & CO
66 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LH
- Phone:
- 02033757000
- Email:
- info@asufoundation.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window