CHILDWALL GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of the Christian religion for the public benefit including by the carrying on of the service of God in accordance with the Old and New Testaments of the Holy Bible as those Christians forming part of the world-wide fellowship known as the "Plymouth Brethren Christian Church (the "Brethren") 2. Any other charitable purposes connected with the Brethren
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 21 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIOT MARCUS HARRIS | Chair | 23 March 2002 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Lander | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Alun Hobbs | Trustee | 12 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.49k | £9.97k | £11.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.49k | £9.97k | £11.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 AUG 2014
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING BY THE CARRYING ON OF THE SERVICE OF GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS OF THE HOLY BIBLE AS FOLLOWED BY THOSE CHRISTIANS FORMING PART OF A WORLD-WIDE FELLOWSHIP KNOWN AS THE 'PLYMOUTH BRETHREN CHRISTIAN CHURCH' (THE 'BRETHREN') WHOSE CORE DOCTRINE IS SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 1 TO THIS DEED AND WHOSE PROPER PRACTICES IN FURTHERANCE OF SOME ASPECTS OF THAT CORE DOCTRINE ARE SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 2 TO THIS DEED; AND B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH BRETHREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
317A UPTON LANE
WIDNES
WA8 9AG
- Phone:
- 01514283430
- Email:
- childwall_ght@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window