FRIENDS OF FAIRFAX HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support of exhbitions, clock maintainance & relevant publications etc at Fairfax House Talks & outings for members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- City Of York
Governance
- 03 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Bundy | Chair | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lawson | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hunter | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Councell | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN FLEMING | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID YATES | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY PUGH | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £10.94k | £4.46k | £8.97k | £7.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.91k | £946 | £2.18k | £12.84k | £2.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 1986 AND 28 NOVEMBER 1992.
Charitable objects
(A) THE EDUCATION OF PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF FAIRFAX HOUSE THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS; AND (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE YORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Field House
The Green
Nun Monkton
York
YO26 8ER
- Phone:
- 01423330456
- Email:
- amjopugh@clannet.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window