THE PEDRO CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pedro Club is a community centre that serves multiple generations in Hackney and provides people with a safe place to thrive, lead healthy lives and fulfil their potential. Located in the Kings Park ward of Hackney. We provide these activities: amateur boxing, football, life skills, education support, music studio, social, cultural and mentoring opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £103,780 from 117468 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 10 September 2021: CIO registration
- 18 August 2023: Funds received from 303022 THE PEDRO CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK WILLIAMS | Chair | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Martinson | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Connell-Hall | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Duberry | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Whiteley | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES COOK | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Baker | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARK CLARKE | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Fenton | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £73.37k | £126.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.75k | £48.77k | £111.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.20k | £103.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (A) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS (?THE AREA OF BENEFIT?) THROUGH (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND (II) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ACTIVITY WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND (B) TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
175 RUSHMORE ROAD
LONDON
E5 0HD
- Phone:
- 02089853800
- Email:
- info@pedroclub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window