Accounts and annual returns MYANMAR CRISIS ACTION

Charity number: 1194969
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 20 March 2025 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 20 March 2025 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2023 16 December 2024 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 20 March 2025 408 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2022 16 December 2024 679 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 20 March 2025 773 days late Download Open in new window