ALBION HOUSE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a community sports hall and youth centre in the Everton area of Liverpool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 08 January 1987: Standard registration
- ALBION HOUSE YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Kinghorn Moon | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Dereck Hesketh | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Christian | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Simpson | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Julie Taubman | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.75k | £51.24k | £21.99k | £61.92k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.10k | £43.68k | £26.06k | £31.69k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.14k | N/A | £25.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2022 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2022 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2022 | 543 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2022 | 543 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF LIVERPOOL THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES BY PROMOTING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALBION HOUSE LIMITED
8-10 ALBION STREET
LIVERPOOL
L5 3QW
- Phone:
- 07946184976
- Email:
- albioncentre2020@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window