STOKEY CATS AND DOGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing care and rescue facilities for animals, in particular feral and stray cats, which on the basis of their age and temperament would not be accepted elsewhere; re-homing of animals that are abandoned, mistreated, lost, stray, feral, vulnerable; providing veterinary treatment for stray animals in need of care; strictly no-kill policy unless the animal is beyond any veterinary help
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 June 2021: CIO registration
- STOKEY CATS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elzbieta Gontarska | Chair | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Akhtar | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nicola | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £7.05k | £10.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £7.68k | £10.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. 2. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
64 Nile Street
LONDON
N1 7SR
- Phone:
- 07498572854
- Email:
- info@stokeycatsanddogs.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window