SAINTS (BRACKLEY) COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of the Saints (Brackley) Community Trust is to enable all people, whether young or old or disabled, to overcome social isolation by means of sport and recreation through the projects it supports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 02 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARYL SUZANNE BILLINGHAM MBE BA | Chair | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janene Elizabeth Butters | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Paul Jones | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Allan Boyland | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Neil Toghill | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian James McEwen Leask | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janine Lay | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.43k | £37.75k | £20.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.15k | £20.66k | £17.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE – TO WORK IN CONJUNCTION WITH BRACKLEY TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB AND OTHER LOCAL VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS BY: I. ENABLING AND PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES BEING LAND AND BUILDINGS) AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES II. PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. III. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY FACILITATING WEEKLY MEETINGS IN A CONVIVIAL ATMOSPHERE IN ORDER TO MEET OTHERS AND ENJOY OTHERS' COMPANY WITH THE PROVISION OF A MEAL AND OCCASIONAL ENTERTAINMENT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRACKLEY TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB
CHURCHILL WAY
BRACKLEY
NN13 7EJ
- Phone:
- 01280704077
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window