Governing document ECCLESFIELD PRIORY PLAYERS
Charity number: 518074

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTED ADOPTED 22 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED 6 JUNE 2007, 5 MARCH 2008 AND 3 MARCH 2010 as amended on 27 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA, AND IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THAT ART.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.