WELLAND GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1198419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide gospel halls for the religious activities of Christians. Detail can be found on the website www.plymouthbrethrenchristianchurch.org. Meetings are held including bible readings & preachings. Gospel literature is provided freely, street preachings are held regularly, food packs are provided to those in need and public events are held where free bibles are distributed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £12,262
Total expenditure: £12,695

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas John Pollard Chair 01 September 2018
None on record
Jonathan Whyles Trustee 01 November 2003
None on record
James William Crawshaw Trustee 01 November 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £14.03k £12.26k
Total expenditure £12.86k £12.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROMAN ROAD BUNGALOW
TOLL BAR
GREAT CASTERTON
STAMFORD
PE9 4BB
Phone:
07824906017
Website:

No information available