Accounts and annual returns CATTERICK GARRISON FOOTBALL CENTRE

Charity number: 1194518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 November 2024 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 November 2024 295 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 21 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 21 May 2023 On Time