COMFORT CASES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Comfort cases are rucksacks filled with essential and comfort items for children and young people entering the care system. Often children move with the clothes on their back or are given a black bin bag for their cherished belongings. We are working to end this practice whilst providing the essentials for a children and young people transitioning into, out of or moving around the care system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Fox | Chair | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giouliana Kadra-Scalzo | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gurvir Henderson | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maurice Benson | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Jeremy Davison | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Chester | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.36k | £163.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.82k | £130.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ENTERING FOSTER CARE PRIMARILY THROUGH PROVIDING ESSENTIAL GOODS/ ITEMS AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE CARE SYSTEM AND THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cannon Hall
Thirsk Road
BOREHAMWOOD
Hertfordshire
WD6 5AY
- Phone:
- 0203 778 2178
- Email:
- hello@comfortcasesuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window