THE EXPOSURE NINJA FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 220 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 220 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 586 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 586 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATION AND MENTORING AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION;
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window