THE VICTORIA HALL (HARTLEY WINTNEY) CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating four halls and one meeting room, which are available for hire by the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD WOODS | Chair | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Martin Donkin | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Springett | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Nicholas James Tadman | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edmund Le Grand Baylis | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Stewart Yule | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Smee | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Richard Charles Gibbons | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £85.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £97.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF HARTLEY WINTNEY IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND BY SO DOING IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A VILLAGE HALL COMPLEX AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR COOPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HARTLEY WINTNEY IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICTORIA HALL CHARITY
VICTORIA HALL
WEST GREEN ROAD
HARTLEY WINTNEY
HOOK
RG27 8RQ
- Phone:
- 01252844876
- Email:
- admin.victoriahall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window