DANDELION DAY NURSERY AND KIDS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dandelion Day Nursery and Kids Club provides childcare provision from birth to 13 for the local community both service and civilian. The nursery facility provides full day care facility for birth to preschool age 4. The kids Club provides before and after school care for children aged 5 to 13 during term time and full day care during school holiday periods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£739,839
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £734.30k | |
Other trading activities | £4.10k | |
Investments | £1.44k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£747,622
Raising funds | £5.67k | |
Charitable activities | £741.95k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £200,816 from 15 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.67k | |
Charitable expenditure | £741.95k |
People

40 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 February 2022: CIO registration
- 28 July 2023: Funds received from 1068762 DANDELION DAY NURSERY AND KIDS' CLUB
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danielle Marie Bogg | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maddy Matthews | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID IAN PAUL TOMKINSON | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Proctor | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HEGARTY | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
TRACY GOULD | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE STRICKLAND | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME LITTLE | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £739.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £747.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £200.82k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £4.10k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £734.30k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1.44k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £741.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £5.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £10.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £17.45k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £278.11k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £12.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2023 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
3. THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 3.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 3.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; 3.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO THE STATUTORY FRAMEWORK FOR THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buildings 419
419A and 613
Clinton Park
Tattershall
Lincolnshire
- Phone:
- 01526344325
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window