NEWFOUNDLAND CANINE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Newfoundland Canine Trust purpose is to educate, advise and promote responsible ownership, contribute funds to preventative research, provide care, treatment and re homing via a network of verified volunteers, provide grants of financial assistance upon scrutinised application.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 October 2021: CIO registration
- NORTHERN CANINE TRUST (Previous name)
- NORTHERN NC TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samson Jones | Chair | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Evans | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Evans | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Jasper | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stella Baxter | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £2.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2021 as amended on 12 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF NEWFOUNDLAND DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS THEM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, A) PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANIMAL WELFARE ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE, TREATMENT AND REHOMING OF NEWFOUNDLAND DOGS; B) OFFERING ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON RESPONSIBLE OWNERSHIP AND ISSUES CONCERNING THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE BREED. C) THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL, SURGICAL OR PREVENTATIVE TREATMENT, CARE AND ADVICE (WHETHER FREE OR AT REDUCED CHARGES) TO NEWFOUNDLAND DOGS BELONGING TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED AND UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SERVICES OF A VETERINARY SURGEON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BRAUNSTONE AVENUE
LEICESTER
LE3 0JF
- Phone:
- 07533710162
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window