HINDU RELIGIOUS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a centre together with facilities to enable peope of the Hindu faith to attend to worship as well as providing religious discourses and providing all kinds of religious services including connected to births, marriages and deaths to the local Hindu community at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 16 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Niranjan Harishanker Bhatt | Chair | 21 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Namratta Bedi | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Veena Seth | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dinesh Maheshwari | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amit Kumar | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pradeep Gupta | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dinesh Arora | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.48k | £38.61k | £48.66k | £33.64k | £88.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.26k | £20.41k | £27.85k | £43.21k | £48.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13 APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED 14 SEPTEMBER 1986.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beam Feature Ltd
3 Adbaston Road
Stretford
MANCHESTER
M32 0TP
- Phone:
- 07788444397
- Email:
- hrstrustuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window