AUTISTIC GIRLS NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving the lives of autistic girls
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £48,365 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Jane May | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Riach | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Ayo Sokale | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lesley Farmer | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elliot George Wassell | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Katharine Burke | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James McDonald | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Warda Ahmed Farah | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Jane McDonald | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.65k | £79.26k | £216.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £32.55k | £133.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.50k | £48.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND RELIEVE NEED AMONGST AUTISTIC GIRLS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR: (1) TO PROVIDE INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SERVICES TO SUPPORT AUTISTIC GIRLS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (2) TO INCREASE AWARENESS OF AND PROMOTE EDUCATION ABOUT THE PROBLEMS AND NEEDS, INCLUDING MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS, OF AUTISTIC GIRLS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AMONGST EDUCATION, HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING PARTICIPATION IN RESEARCH STUDIES; (3) TO FOSTER MUTUAL HELP, CO-OPERATION AND FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN PARENTS, FAMILIES, CARERS, HELPERS AND THOSE ENTRUSTED WITH THE CARE OF AUTISTIC GIRLS. THE EXPRESSION "AUTISTIC GIRLS" IN THIS DOCUMENT SHALL INCLUDE GIRLS WITH AUTISM AND RELATED CONDITIONS, DIAGNOSED AND UNDIAGNOSED, AND INCLUSIVE OF TRANS AND GENDER NON-BINARY CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 South Green Drive
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 9HP
- Phone:
- 07825326820
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window