KEIGHLEY U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KEIGHLEY THIRD AGE GROUP IS PART OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE A NATIONAL BODY WHICH AIMS TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR RETIRED PEOPLE TO MEET AND SHARE THEIR INTERESTS IN A VARIETY OF WAYS, EXTENDING THEIR MINDS AND UNDERSTANDING BY MUTUAL HELP AND STIMULATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 14 October 1986: Standard registration
- KEIGHLEY THIRD AGE GROUP (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Pennington | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Butler | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynaire Munton | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Normington | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Rita Ann Portlock | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Eileen Wilson | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mavis Dixon | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Catherine Rye | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Farrar | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Boddy | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.37k | £1.45k | £1.07k | £3.12k | £3.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £1.69k | £1.43k | £5.75k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH JANUARY 1986.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND ELDERLY PEOPLE IN KEIGHLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Area of benefit
KEIGHLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Oak Bank Broadway
Oakworth
KEIGHLEY
BD22 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01535662944
- Email:
- D.R.BODDY@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window