PARENTS OF MEONCROSS

Charity number: 1194358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school. In particular by developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school and engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £19,676
Total expenditure: £15,437

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • POM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerry Saunders Trustee 10 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £16.95k £19.68k
Total expenditure £13.53k £15.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MEONCROSS SCHOOL
65 BURNT HOUSE LANE
FAREHAM
PO14 2EF
Phone:
01329662182
Website:

No information available